Allbaugh v. California Field Ironworkers Pension Trust et al

Plaintiff: Donald Allbaugh
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the California Field Ironworkers Pension Trust, Plan Administrator of the California Field Ironworkers Pension Trust and California Field Ironworkers Pension Trust
Case Number: 2:2012cv00561
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2016 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 137 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED; that 142 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to to the portion of Count 1 alleging claims under 29 U.S.C. § 1132(a)(1)(B) and the portion of Count 5 seeking statutory damages for the failure to timely provide Allbaugh with a copy of the actuarial tables; it is DENIED in all other respects; that 144 Request for Judicial Notice is DENIED; that 145 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; that 178 Motion to Supplement is GRANTED; and that 150 Motion to Seal the declaration of Leanne Vance and exhibit 1 thereto is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; the Clerk of Court is directed to SEAL exhibit 1 [ECF No. 150-1 at 520] only.FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred to a Magistrate Judge to schedule a MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 13, 2016 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 182 Motion to Remove Attorney L. Ashlie Surur from Electronic Service List is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 6/13/2016 to correct typo (MMM).
December 23, 2015 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 156 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal is denied without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 162 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 23, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 112 Motion for Leave to File Documents Bates Numbered CFIPT 003849-CFIPT 003857 Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 4, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 38 Motion for Certification is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff Donald Allbaugh is hereby appointed as the Class Representative. The law firms of Martin & Bonnett, PLLC and Michael D. Lore PC are appointed as Class Counsel for the Class. Plaintiff has 30 days to submit a proposed Notice of Class Action for approval. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 20, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 37 Motion to Amend is GRANTED. Defendant's Countermotion to Strike (contained within 42 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 57 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/20/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 26, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Granting 25 Stipulated Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allbaugh v. California Field Ironworkers Pension Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Allbaugh
Represented By: Kathleen J England
Represented By: Jennifer Kroll
Represented By: Michael D Lore
Represented By: Susan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the California Field Ironworkers Pension Trust, Plan Administrator of the California Field Ironworkers Pension Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Field Ironworkers Pension Trust
Represented By: Kathleen M Paustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?