Martinez v. Karafeziev et al

Defendant: Bulex Service Corporation and Kostadin Stoykov Karafeziev
Plaintiff: Oscar Ulises Martinez
Case Number: 2:2012cv00569
Filed: April 6, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The parties requested an extension of the current discovery deadlines with the Court in a motion hearing on February 1, 2016. The Court granted an extension of the discovery cut-off date to March 31, 2016. Accordingly, the following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply: Discovery due by 3/31/2016. Motions due by 5/2/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 7, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 88 Joint MOTION to Extend Discovery (Fourth Request). Discovery due by 7/7/2015. Motions due by 8/6/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 7, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a Status Report by 2/18/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 11, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The discovery plan and scheduling order submitted by the parties does not comply with LR 26-1(e)(1). The parties shall, within 10 days of this order, either a submit a proposed discovery plan in compliance with LR 26-1(e) or a proposed plan s tating on its face "Special Scheduling Review Requested" and setting forth the reasons why longer or different time periods should apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 17, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than 5/29/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Karafeziev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulex Service Corporation
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kostadin Stoykov Karafeziev
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Ulises Martinez
Represented By: Victor M. Cardoza
Represented By: Adam S. Kutner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?