Hagos et al v. Washington Mutual Bank et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Hagos and Miyuki Akui
Defendant: La Salle Bank National Association, MERS, Wamu Asset Acceptance Corporation, Wamu Mortgage Pass-through Certificate Series 2006-AR19, Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp. and JP Morgan Chase
Case Number: 2:2012cv00587
Filed: April 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying 25 Plaintiffs' Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 03/05/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 18 Proposed Order Canceling Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Exhibit A and Exhibit B of Proposed Order 18 added to approved order per request of counsel.) (KMC).
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 14 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and 15 Motion to Expunge Plaintiffs' Fugitive Documents of Record Related to the Subject Property. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment be entered against Plaintiffs and in favor of Defendants JP Morgan Chase, MERS, Wamu Asset Acceptance Corporation, Washington Mutual Bank, and Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagos et al v. Washington Mutual Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Salle Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wamu Asset Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wamu Mortgage Pass-through Certificate Series 2006-AR19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Represented By: Katie M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miyuki Akui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?