Teller v. Dogge Featured Case

Defendant: Gerard Dogge
Plaintiff: Teller
Case Number: 2:2012cv00591
Filed: April 11, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2012 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Teller that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Buggs & Rudy Discount Corp. for Teller added.. (Tratos, Mark)
April 27, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff shall file his Certificate of Interested Parties by 5/2/2012. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
April 25, 2012 5 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Teller. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Tratos, Mark)
April 11, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Gerard Dogge (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-2334374), filed by Teller. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/21/2012. Proof of service due by 8/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons) (Tratos, Mark) Corrected image 5 filed on 4/25/2012 (SRK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teller v. Dogge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Dogge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teller
Represented By: Peter H. Ajemian
Represented By: Mark G Tratos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?