Rembrandt Gaming Technologies, LP v. Boyd Gaming Corporation et al

Defendant: Boyd Gaming Corporation, Caesars Entertainment Operating Company, Inc., MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc., Penn National Gaming, Inc. and WMS Gaming, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rembrandt Gaming Technologies, LP
Case Number: 2:2012cv00775
Filed: May 9, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2016 234 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 19, 2016 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 212 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 5/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 21, 2016 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 205 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., on 4/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 5, 2016 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 186 motion for entry of final judgment. Clerk to enter judgment of non-infringement in favor of Defendants and close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 27, 2016 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 192 Motion to Stay is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 195 Motion for Entry of a Second Amended Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 24, 2015 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court notes that the parties made several arguments and cited to several cases not discussed. The Court has reviewed these arguments and cases and determines that they do not warrant discussion as they do not affect the outcome of this claim construction. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 23, 2015 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 148 Stipulation to Extend Time. Reply brief due by 6/29/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 14, 2015 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 134 Stipulation to Allow Defendants to Amend Answers. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 12, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 133 Stipulation to Remove for all Purposes Defendant LV Gaming Ventures, LLC and to Substitute in LVGV, LLC. LVGV, LLC added. LV Gaming Ventures, LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 20, 2015 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 98 MOTION to Compel is GRANTED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall promptly produce the TechnicalDocuments and Financial Documents encompassed by this order. Status Report due by 4/30/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 3, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 60 Motion to Stay. The matter is STAYED pending the PTO's reexamination of the '477 patent. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Rembrandt shall file a status report every ninety (90) days to update the Court on the reexaminatio n proceedings and to provide notice to the Court when the reexamination proceedings conclude and the PTO issues its decision in the reexamination request. The parties are then to confer and submit a joint status report to the Court. ALL OTHER PENDING MOTIONS ARE DENIED with leave for the moving party to renew when the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 20, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 08/20/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rembrandt Gaming Technologies, LP v. Boyd Gaming Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd Gaming Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment Operating Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn National Gaming, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMS Gaming, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rembrandt Gaming Technologies, LP
Represented By: Shane A Brunner
Represented By: Regina V Culbert
Represented By: Jennifer Dorsey
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Christopher J Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?