Andrew et al v. Century Surety Company
Plaintiff: Dana Andrew and Ryan T Pretner
Defendant: Century Surety Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv00978
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties are to file a stipulation to dismiss within 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 285 , 288 the motions for reconsideration are DENIED without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 293 Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's request that Mr. Prince identify counsel other than himself to represent Plaintiff is DENIED without prejudice.Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting 283 Stipulation; Motions for Reconsideration due by 7/17/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the stay of this case is lifted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may file motions for reconsideration by 7/1/19. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting 261 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Michael B. Brennan withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 253 defendant Century Surety Company's motion to stay proceedings is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending an answer from the Supreme Court of Nevada on the certified question. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that 218 defendant Century Surety Company's motion for reconsideration is DENIED without prejudice to re-file once the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING REPLY DEADLINE. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Century Surety Company's deadline to file a reply to 218 its motion to reconsider is due five days after I rule on 253 Century's motion to stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the briefing on the motion to stay shall proceed in the ordinary course. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER Certifying question to the Supreme Court of Nevada. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Certified 168 and 210 to NV Supreme Court - JM)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 245 the plaintiffs' motion to lift stay is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file a response to 218 the defendant's motion for reconsideration on or before 8/9/17. The defen dant shall file a reply on or before 8/18/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint status report on or before 8/11/17 regarding whether I ought to certify to the Supreme Court of Nevada the same question that was certified in Nalder and/or any other questions of law. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 217 the defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER Granting 242 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is stayed pending an answer from the Supreme Court of Nevada on the certified question in Nalder. The parties shall notify the court within 10 days of the Supreme Court issuing its decision. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Suspending Briefing on Motion for Reconsideration and Requiring Briefs on Whether this case Should be Stayed. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that by 6/30/16, the parties shall file a joint or separate briefs about whether this case should be stayed pending an answer from the Supreme Court of Nevada on the certified question in Nalder. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER Granting 215 Stipulation Extending Time to file Joint Pretrial Order (Second Request). The parties shall file their Joint Pre-trial Order by 8/26/16. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Granting 213 Stipulation Extending Time to file Joint Pre-trial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/9/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file their proposed Joint Pretrial Order by 1/8/16. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 192 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 194 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 197 Motion to Strike is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a proposed Joint Pretrial Order as required under the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Notice of Intent to Reconsider and Order Setting Hearing. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that oral argument on 192 Defendants motion for Summary Judgment, 194 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, and 197 Plaintiffs Motion to Strike, and this Noti ce of Intent to Reconsider will be held on Thursday, September 17, 2015 on a stacked calendar at 2:00 p.m. at the Thomas & Mack Moot Court Room at UNLVs Boyd School of Law. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting 190 Stipulated Proposed Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 11/10/2014. Responses due by 12/15/2014. Replies due by 1/16/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER that 176 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Denying 145 Defendant's Motion to Strike Amended Complaint; Denying 158 Defendant's Motion for Reimbursement of Fees and Costs; and Granting 163 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Response. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 05/01/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 127 Plaintiffs' Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order and Granting in part and Denying in part 132 Defendant's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Summary Judgment is entered in favor of Century on Plaintiffs' claims of bad faith and violation of the Unfair Claims Practices Act. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 04/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with therequirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 4:00 p.m., December 9, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER that Defendant's Written Objections/Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Evidence Filed in Opposition to Century's Counter Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (contained within 114 ) is OVERRULED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Written Objections to Supplemental Affidavit of Eric Tran Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Century's Written Objections/Motion to Strike Evidence in Support of Century's Motion for Summary Judgment (contained within 114 is OVERRULED. FURTHER ORDERED that 109 Motion to Extend the Page Limit is DENIED Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER that Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice Submitted in Support ofits Counter Motion for Summary Judgment 73 is GRANTED in part. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/27/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that the hearing scheduled for May 21, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED, as the parties have advised the court that a hearing is no longer required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/20/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 54 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Response to Reply to Opposition to 27 MOTION to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) .
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Extend Time to Amend Pleadings and Add Parties. The discovery plan and scheduling order deadlines are extended as enumerated in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew et al v. Century Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Andrew
Represented By: Dennis M Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan T Pretner
Represented By: Dennis M Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Surety Company
Represented By: Maria Louise Cousineau
Represented By: Alan J. Lefebvre
Represented By: William D. Schuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?