Sloan v. Country Preferred Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lucia Sloan
Defendant: Country Preferred Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv01085
Filed: June 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that 49 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Prejudgment Interest is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 48 Bill of Costs is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 47 Bill of Costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 35 Country Preferred Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING 34 Plaintiff Lucia Sloan's Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk of court shall enter judgment in Country Preferred Insurance Company's favor. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 20 Motion to Adjudicate Attorney Lien. The Richard Harris Law Firm is awarded $1,666.00 for its attorneys' lien in this matter. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 21 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the Harris Firm produce evidence as directed in this Order on or before April 15, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 20 Motion to Adjudicate Attorney Lien will be determined after the Harris Firm complies with this Order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/4/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/04/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sloan v. Country Preferred Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mastrangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Sloan
Represented By: David J. Churchill
Represented By: Jolene J Manke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?