Heldt et al v. American Invsco Corporation et al

Defendant: Koval Flamingo, LLC
702) 382-8135 (fax: American Invsco Corporation, Condominium Rental Services, Inc. and Nicholas Gouletas
702) 454-3333 (fax: Mary Heldt and Victor Heldt
702) 454- 3333 (fax: Snap Properties, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv01107
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2017 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Status Conference is set for 7/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 8, 2017 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT. On or before 6/30/2017 the parties shall file a status report regarding what, if anything, remains to be resolved in cases 2:12-cv-1104, 2:12-cv-1106, 2:12-cv-1107, 2:12-cv-1108, and 2:12-cv-1111. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 24, 2016 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 5/26/2016 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 5/24/2016 to correct typo - nef regenerated (MMM).
June 11, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 129 Unopposed Renewed Motion for Exception to Personal Attendance Requirement Regarding Settlement Conferences. Mr. Gouletas may appear by telephone and on an as-needed basis at the settlement conferences. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 3, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 126 Unopposed Motion Request for Exception to Personal Attendance Requirement Regarding Settlement Conferences. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 28, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting a Scheduling Conference for 5/6/2014 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 31, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 68 Motion to Dismiss. Denying 100 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 21, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion to Strike in case 2:12-cv-1104-APG-NJK. Defendants are sanctioned in the amount of $675.15, payable to Plaintiffs or their counsel, and due forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 22, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Motion Hearing re 92 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is set for 10/29/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Responses to 92 Motion are due by 10/25/2013. No later than 10/24/2013, Defendants current counsel of record shall notify Defendants of this order that they appear and shall file a proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 21, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 90 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 19, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 85 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Michael Mackenzie Should Not be Held in Contempt of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall notify Michael Mackenzie of the contents of this order no late r than 7:00 p.m. today, 8/19/2013. The hearing on this matter set for 8/21/2013, at 2:00 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 08/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 29, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 82 Objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 22, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part 18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Granting 32 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, subject to the Amended Complaint being revised as set forth in the Order. Plaintiffs shall file their F irst Amended Complaint on or before 14 days after the date of entry of this Order. Defendants shall file an Answer or other responsive pleading on or before 14 days after the date of filing of the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 05/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 27, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING re 53 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Discovery. Responses or any additional Joinders due by 3/29/2013. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2013 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 26, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 48 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heldt et al v. American Invsco Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 382-8135 (fax: American Invsco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 382-8135 (fax: Condominium Rental Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 382-8135 (fax: Nicholas Gouletas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 454-3333 (fax: Mary Heldt
Represented By: Amy M Gamage
Represented By: William H Gamage
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Represented By: Steven M Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 454-3333 (fax: Victor Heldt
Represented By: Amy M Gamage
Represented By: William H Gamage
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Represented By: Steven M Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koval Flamingo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 454- 3333 (fax: Snap Properties, LLC
Represented By: Amy M Gamage
Represented By: William H Gamage
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Represented By: Steven M Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?