Pitts v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Gareth E. Pitts
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2012cv01109
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Adopting in its entirety Magistrate Judge Leen's 28 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Remand to Social Security Administration is Denied. Defendant's 27 Cross-Motion to Affirm is Granted. The Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the 4 summons and 3 Complaint by certified mail to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. Mr. Marc Kalagian, shall have until August 13, 2012, to comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/31/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: US Attorney and Certified Copies Mailed to General Counsel, Social Security Administration and the Attorney General of the United States - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gareth E. Pitts
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?