United States of America v. $91,110.00 in United States Currency

Defendant: $91,110.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2012cv01112
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Unopposed Motion To Extend The Time For Show Cause Proceedings, giving the parties an additional 60 days, until 11/30/2016, to finalize settlement negotiations in this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 9, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time for Show Cause Proceedings re ECF No. 30 Minute Order. Show Cause Response due by 9/30/2016. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 5, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 4/5/2016, granting Plaintiff's 31 Motion to Continue Show Cause Proceedings. Plaintiff shall have until 5/31/2016 by which to finalize settlement negotiations. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 7, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 22 Motion to Strike 20 Notice of Claim of Linda Pitts in her Purported Official Capacity as Representative of the Estate of Noel Heard for her/its Failure to Comply with the Pleading Requirements of Supplemental Rule G(5). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 22, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk for reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03//22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 21, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 12 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Answer of Noel Heard. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Heards estates representatives have twenty 20 days to comply with the requirements of Supplemental Rule G(5). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that th e United States Ex Parte 13 Motion for an Order to Seal its Motion to Strike is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The United States is directed to re-file its Motion to Strike unsealed and without Attachments 3 and 4. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 03/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $91,110.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $91,110.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael A Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?