Naoumi v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Roy E. Naoumi
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2012cv01140
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that 34 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge are ADOPTED in their entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 28 Defendant's Cross-motion to affirm is GRANTED. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall serve the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada by delivering a copy of the 7 Summons and 1 Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. The Clerk of Court shall also re-serve the United States Attorney General. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the Summons and Complaint by certified mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 2 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk of Court to file Complaint and serve Commissioner of Social Security by certified mail. Clerk of Court to issue Summons to U.S. Attorney. Plaintiff's counsel, Frederick J. Daley Jr. shall have until 8/14/12 to comply with requirements of Local Rule IA 10-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/31/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS, cert mail to Soc Sec, summons and complaint to U.S.Atty)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naoumi v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy E. Naoumi
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?