Traylor Parker v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Evelyn D. Traylor Parker
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Unknown: Steven G. Rosales
Case Number: 2:2012cv01152
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 18 Plaintiff's Motion to Serve Party with Summons and Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada by delivering a copy of the 8 Summons and 7 Complaint to the U.S.Mar shal for service. The Clerk of Court shall also re-serve the United States Attorney General with the 8 Summons and 7 Complaint by certified mail, and file proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/08/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Serve Additional Party with Summons and Complaint. Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail to address noted in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/22/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified mail tracking #7012 1010 0001 2174 9602 - EDS)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk of Court shall file complaint. Clerk of Court shall serve Commissioner of Social Security Administration and the Attorney General of the United States with a copy of summons and complaint by certified mail to addresses noted in this Order. Clerk of Court shall issue summons to United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver summons and complaint to US Marshal for service. Plaintiff's counsel, Mr. Steven G. Rosales shall have until 8/19/12, to comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/30/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: summons and complaint by certified mail - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traylor Parker v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn D. Traylor Parker
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Steven G. Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?