Wang v. Country Wide Bank, N.A. and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP et al
Plaintiff: Jun Y Wang
Defendant: Country Wide Bank, N.A. and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Merscorp, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01161
Filed: July 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that 19 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. All claims are dismissed, except the claim for statutorily defective foreclosure. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Defendants Through Counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/02/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Country Wide Bank, N.A. and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Wide Bank, N.A. and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merscorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jun Y Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?