Britain et al v. Clark County, Nevada
Plaintiff: Trina Britain, Ronald Brooks, Bret Cegavske, Dennis Curran, Ian Massy, Karen Pixler, Anthony Smith, Michael Smith, Anthony Vogel and Lamons Walker
Defendant: Clark County, Nevada
Case Number: 2:2012cv01240
Filed: July 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER. Based on 221 the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, and with no reason to delay, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs except as described in the stipulation. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER re 219 Declaration. Dismissal papers shall be filed by 9/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER Denying without prejudice 203 Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement. Defendant's counsel shall file a further declaration, no later than 9/8/2017, regarding the Board meeting scheduled for 9/5/2017. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER that 208 Motion to Seal is DENIED and the Clerk is INSTRUCTED to unseal 210 Exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER re 208 Motion to Seal. Any party wishes to keep this transcript sealed, it must file a statement explaining grounds for so doing by 7/28/2017. If no party files such a statement, the motion to seal will be denied and the transcript will be unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that the sealed audio recording shall be unsealed for the limited purpose of preparing the transcript by Felicia Zabin and providing a copy of the transcript to Teletha Zupan, Esq., as requested. IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that the audio recording shall thereafter be resealed and a certified copy of the transcript be delivered to the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 753(b) and remain sealed until further order of this Court. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: ECRO, Transcriber - MR)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that the sealed audio recording shall be unsealed for the limited purpose of preparing the transcript by Felicia Zabin and providing a copy of the transcript to Andrew Rempfer, Esq., as requested. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the audio recording shall thereafter be resealed and a certified copy of the transcript be delivered to the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 753(b) and remain sealed until further order of this Court. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: ECRO, Transcriber - MR)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that the sealed audio recording shall be unsealed for the limited purpose of preparing the transcript by Felicia Zabin and providing a copy of the transcript to Cayla Witty, Esq., as requested. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that the audio recording shall thereafter be resealed and a certified copy of the transcript be delivered to the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 753(b) and remain sealed until further order of this Court. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: ECRO, Transcriber - MR)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Granting 201 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 200 Settlement Conference (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER that 160 Motion to Substitute Attorneys is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; that 165 Motion to Submit Evidence is DENIED; that 169 Motion to Strike is GRANTED, and the clerk shall strike 164 Reply; that 170 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER re 161 Motion. IT IS ORDERED that Pursuant to 167 the notice of withdrawal, the Court hereby DENIES 161 as moot Defendant's motion to reopen discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER RE 155 Notice re Discovery. Because this document was filed in violation of the rules, it shall be STRICKEN by the Clerk. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Granting in part 151 First Motion For Clarification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re 142 Order to Show Cause. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for filing the joint pretrial order until 14 days after the magistrate judge has resolved the pending representation issues 147 151 . This matter is referred to the magistrate judge to schedule this case for a mandatory settlement conference after those representation issues have been resolved. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 111 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting 113 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to 111 Motion for Approval. Responses due by 5/25/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting 110 Stipulation to Extend the TIme for Filing the Joint Pre-Trial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER that 71 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 75 Motion for Conditional Approval of an FLSA Opt-In Class is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the April 7, 2015, motion hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/31/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Denying without prejudice 87 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of 75 Motion for Collective Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 05/06/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Denying without prejudice 13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 27 Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Collective Action Under the Fair Labor Standards Act is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion deadline is extended to 2/14/2014. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Temporarily Unsealing Transcript re 61 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/31/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Plaintiffs' Motion for an Exception to the Personal Attendance Requirements for the Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Outlining Standards Applicable to Future Requests for Discovery Extensions Filed in this Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britain et al v. Clark County, Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Britain
Represented By: Adam Levine
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Brooks
Represented By: Adam Levine
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Cegavske
Represented By: Adam Levine
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Curran
Represented By: Adam Levine
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Massy
Represented By: Adam Levine
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Pixler
Represented By: Adam Levine
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Smith
Represented By: Adam Levine
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: Adam Levine
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Vogel
Represented By: Adam Levine
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamons Walker
Represented By: Adam Levine
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County, Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?