Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Rossal et al
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: Chano's Landscaping, Inc., Feliciano Rossal and Onelia Rossal
Case Number: 2:2012cv01298
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Vacate Judgments (ECF No. 85 ) is denied. It is further ordered that Plaintiff's motion to file sur-reply (ECF No. 92 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 78 Motion for Attorney's Fees re ECF No. 83 Proposed Order : Plaintiff is entitled to fees in the amount of $60,935.65. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the fair market value of the property on the date of the trustee's sale was $90,000.00, which is lower than the trustee's sale price of $144,000.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, taking the a mount of the indebtedness on the date of the trustee's sale ($243,027.27) and providing Defendant credit for the trustee's sale price ($144,000.00), the amount of the deficiency owed by Defendant to Plaintiff on 2/29/12 was $ 99,037.27.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that as of 11/20/15, the deficiency amount of $163,361.98.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment shall accrue at the legal rate from the date of judgment until the judgment is paid in full. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 65 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 67 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiff's deficiency claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's [6 8] Motion for a Deficiency Judgment Hearing is GRANTED. The Court will set a hearing to determined the fair market value of the property at the time it was sold. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs Status Report 61 . This action is stayed with respect to Defendants Feliciano Rossal and Chanos Landscaping Inc. in light of the application of the automatic stay under 11 U.S.C. § 362. The action is n ot stayed with respect to Defendant Onelia Rossal. Plaintiff has moved for summary judgment, which Onelia Rossal has not opposed. The Court extends additional time, up to August 6, 2014, for Defendant Onelia Rossal to file her response to Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment 39 . Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 46 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Vacating the hearing scheduled for 4/11/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Chano's Landscaping, Inc. shall have until 4/25/2014 to retain new counsel. H. Stan Johnson and Brian A. Morris withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 04/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Defendants at last known address - AC)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that 20 MOTION to Stay is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's alternative request to extend the discovery deadlines is GRANTED as follows: Discovery due by 1/16/2014; Motions due by 2/17/2014; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/15/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/31/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying as moot 21 Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time. A Motion Hearing is set for 10/31/2013 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr re 20 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/23/2013. Replies due by 10/28/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Rossal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Represented By: Jeremy J. Nork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chano's Landscaping, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feliciano Rossal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onelia Rossal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?