Cohen et al v. Hansen et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Stephen Cohen and Cohen Asset Management, Inc.
Defendant: Steven Merrill Finch, Ross B. Hansen and Northwest Territorial Mint, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv01401
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDERED that any and all stock in Medallic Art Corporation held by Defendant/Judgment Debtor Ross B. Hansen is hereby charged with the payment of the unsatisfied amount of the Judgment as set forth in this order. FURTHER ORDERED that all economic d istributions to be directed to Defendant/Judgment Debtor Ross B. Hansen now be directed to Plaintiffs/Judgment Creditors, unless and until Defendant/Judgment Debtor Ross B. Hansens Judgment amounts, including interest, are paid in full. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 419 replaced on 10/31/2016 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 406 AMENDED ORDER Granting 400 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam of Steven Earl Firebaugh. Proof of service on Steven Earl Firebaugh of this Order shall be filed with this Court prior to the scheduled examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER Denying Defendants Ross B. Hansen, Northwest Territorial Mint, LLC, and Steven Earl Firebaugh's 348 Motion for New Trial or, in the alternative, Remittitur or Relief Pursuant to Rule 60(b). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 04/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER re 378 Motion for to Charge Membership Interest Pursuant to NRS 86.401. ORDERED that any membership interest in Medallic Art Company LLC held by Judgment Debtor Ross B. Hansen is hereby charged with the payment of the unsatisfied amount as set forth above. FURTHER ORDERED that all economic distributions to be directed to Judgment Debtor shall now be directed to Judgment Creditors, until Judgment Debtor's judgment amounts, including interest are paid in full. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER denying 349 motion to stay execution of judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER that 329 plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen and Cohen Asset Management, Inc.'s Motion for Permanent Injunction is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Ross. B. Hansen, Northwest Territorial Mint, LLC, and Steven Earl Firebaugh are enjoined from republishing the false and defamatory statements on the websites www.bradley-cohen.com and www.bradleyscohen.com.FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Ross. B. Hansen, Northwest Territorial Mint, LLC, and Steven Earl Firebaugh shall forthw ith take down the remaining website at www.bradleyscohen.com and assign the domain names for the websites www.bradley-cohen.com and www.bradleyscohen.com to plaintiff Bradley Stephen Cohen. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER that 302 Motion to Strike Defendants' Belated Reply is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER that 300 plaintiffs Bradley Stephen Cohen and Cohen Asset Management, Inc.s Motion for reconsideration of the courts order continuing trial is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the time period for filing pretrial motions is CLOSED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER that 296 Motion to Continue Trial is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the jury trial currently scheduled for January 4, 2016, at 9:00 A.M. be vacated and continued to February 8, 2016, at 9:00 A.M. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for calendar call on February 3, 2016, at 1:30 P.M. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER that 229 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER that 205 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED with respect to plaintiffs' claim for defamation, CAM's claim of invasion of privacy/false light, and plaintiffs' claim for intentional interference with future expected busines s, and DENIED with respect to all other claims. Plaintiffs' claim for defamation per se and Cohen's claim for false light invasion of privacy shall proceed. FURTHER ORDERED that Cohen and CAM's claim for injunctive relief against defendants be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Granting 203 Motion for Permission to File Over-Length Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/23/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER that 198 Motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions is GRANTED and Defendants shall have until December 19, 2014, in which to refile a motion for summary judgment. The parties shall be required to file a joint pretrial order by Janu ary 2, 2015, as ordered. The response to the motion for summary judgment shall be due January 12, 2015. The reply shall be due January 26, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER that the parties shall have until January 2, 2015, in which to file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and 16-4. FURTHER ORDERED that 196 Motion to Set Pretrial Conference is DENIED as the court will set a trial date once the parties submit a joint pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/3/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER that 180 Plaintiffs' objection to Magistrate Judge Leen's May 8, 2014, order excluding evidence of plaintiffs' special damages is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 192 Plaintiffs' objection to Magistrate Judge Leen's July 15, 2014, order denying plaintiffs' motion for leave to subpoena a deposition of Chris C. Keenan is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER that 179 Plaintiff's Request for Clarification Re: Magistrate Judge's May 8, 2014 Order Excluding Evidence of Plaintiffs' Special Damages is GRANTED to the extent that the court clarifies the written order expressed exactly what the court intended. Plaintiffs' request to modify the order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/23/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER that 119 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 145 Motion for Hearing is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER that 150 MOTION To Exclude Evidence Regarding Plaitiffs' Actual Damages is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiffs shall be precluded from claiming or introducing any evidence of quantifiable economic harm attributable to the Defend ants' alleged conduct for any purpose in this case, including motion practice and trial. FURTHER ORDERED that 175 Motion to Strike Sur-Reply is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER that 164 Motion to Continue Hearing is GRANTED. The Hearing of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Evidence of Actual Damages 150 currently scheduled for March 27, 2014 at 11:00 a.m., shall be VACATED and RESCHEDULED for April 22, 2014, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 3B. The undersigned will advise Judge Mahan's chambers of the continuation of this hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER that 159 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED. Ronald D Green, Jr; Marc J Randazza; James M DeVoy, IV and Evan Dwin withdrawn from the case as counsel for Defendant Ross B. Hansen, Northwest Territorial Mint, LLC, and Steven Earl Firebaugh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER that sanctions in the amount of $1,140.00 are awarded in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Denying 114 Plaintiffs' Motion to Set a Pre-Trial Conference. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER that Bradley Stephen Cohen and Cohen Asset Management, Inc., shall serve Defendants with supplemental written responses to Defendants Interrogatories Nos. 5, 6, 7, and 14 no later than August 6, 2013. Plaintiff Bradley Stephen Cohen shall se rve Defendants with supplemental responses to Defendants Request for Production of Documents Nos. 9, 10, 11, 12, 18, 19, 20, 23, 27, 28, and 29 no later than August 6, 2013. Plaintiff Cohen Asset Management, Inc. shall serve Defendants with supple mental responses to Defendants Requests for Production of Documents Nos. 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 20, 21, 22, 23, 28, and 29 no later than August 6, 2013. Plaintiffs shall serve Defendants with responses and produce all responsive documents to the above-referenced discovery requests pursuant to the Protective Order 73 entered by the court on June 4, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/24/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER that 45 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 51 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 52 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 57 Motion to Strike Defendants' Reply to the Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/24/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re 67 Status Report. The Status Conference scheduled for 5/21/13 at 9:45 am is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/20/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 50 Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures and Compel Production of Documents. Defendants shall produce initial disclosures no later than 4/26/13. A discovery and dispute resolution conference is set for 5/7/13 at 09:00 AM in LV Cou rtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Parties shall file a joint status report no later than 5/2/13. The deadline for filing motion to amend the pleadings is extended until 6/28/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 18 Defendants Ross B. Hansen and Northwest Territorial Mint, LLC.'s Motion to Set Aside 17 Clerk's Entry of Default. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 20 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. The motion is denied without pre judice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 34 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file amended complaint attached as exhibit 1 within 10 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen et al v. Hansen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Stephen Cohen
Represented By: David Z. Chesnoff
Represented By: Anthony Michael Glassman
Represented By: Richard A Schonfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cohen Asset Management, Inc.
Represented By: David Z. Chesnoff
Represented By: Anthony Michael Glassman
Represented By: Richard A Schonfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Merrill Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross B. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Territorial Mint, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?