BMO Harris Bank, N.A. v. Kalamchi
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Ali Kalamchi
Case Number: 2:2012cv01448
Filed: August 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 88 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. All pending motions are hereby DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall reimburse the Defendant for $969. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDERED that the Defendant file an affidavit with the Court listing the reasonable travel and lodging expenses that he expended to attend the August 5, 2014 settlement conference. When possible, the Defendant shall also attach receipts to verify th e expenditures. The Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days from the date the affidavit is entered to file an opposition to the listed expenses. Defendant shall have ten (10) days from the date the opposition is filed to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Referring Case for Settlement Conference. IT IS ORDERED that this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Foley, Jr. for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 06/02/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that 9 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank, N.A. v. Kalamchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Shadd A. Wade
Represented By: Aaron M. Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Kalamchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?