Ventrella v. Trump Ruffin Tower I, LLC dba Trump International Hotel Las Vegas
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ventrella
Defendant: Trump Ruffin Tower I, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv01450
Filed: August 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. This court no longer has subject matter jurisdiction and must remand the case to state court for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified copy of docket sheet and Order to state court - SLD)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying 46 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Regarding Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the court shall accept Defendants removal of this action and exercise diversity jurisdiction over the complaint. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying as moot 6 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/6/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Defendant is granted 20 days to establish the minimum amount in controversy for federal jurisdiction. Plaintiff is granted 10 days to file an opposition. No reply is required. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/22/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ventrella v. Trump Ruffin Tower I, LLC dba Trump International Hotel Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trump Ruffin Tower I, LLC
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Represented By: David B. Avakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ventrella
Represented By: Ben J Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?