Williams, Jr. v. State of Nevada et al

Defendant: Cheryl Burson, Sheryl Foster, Renee Galvan, State of Nevada, State of Nevada, ex rel and Brian Williams
Plaintiff: Oscar Williams, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01913
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 85 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice, and that each party will bear their own attorney fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
November 4, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Nunc Pro Tunc Granting 78 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/26/2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is referred to a magistrate judge other than Magistrate Judge Koppe or Magistrate Judge Fole y to schedule a settlement conference in approximately 60 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file by November 25, 2015, a notice in this matter and in Williamss other matter (2:09-cv-1979-KJD-GWF). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 14, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Motion for Limited Admission. Mr. Barrick is granted leave to participate for the limited purpose of settlement discussions only. In the event that settlement is not obtained, he shall have no other obligations in this matter and shall not be listed as counsel of record should the matter proceed into continued litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
September 8, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 69 Motion Setting Forth Non-Compliance and 70 Motion for Clarification. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 28, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 35 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Summary judgment is entered in favor of defendants Brian Williams, Cheryl Burson, and Sheryl Foster on the only claim against them; and the motion is DENIED in all other respects. The case proceeds on a single, First Amendment retaliation claim remaining against Officer Renee Galvan only. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 16, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 30 Report and Recommendation in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend is DENIED and 25 Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 01/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 16, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the clerk shall SERVE a copy of this order and plaintiff's complaint on the Office of the Attorney General for the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Within 21 days of entry of this order, subject to the findings of the Screening Order 12 , the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court and plaintiff regarding service on the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 1, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 18 Motion for an Extension of the Stay and Status Report Deadline is GRANTED. The stay in this action is extended until August 15, 2013. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file the status report, in compliance with the screening order, not later than August 15, 2013. FURTHER ORDERED that 17 Motion for Clarification is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 8, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Informal Settlement Discussions. This case will not be referred for formal mediation. However, given the nature of the claims the Court has permitted to proceed, the Court finds that the parties will benefit from informal discussions in an effort to settle this case. The Court encourages the parties to engage in such discussions. For this reason, a courtesy copy of this order and the complaint shall be provided to defendants counsel by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams, Jr. v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Burson
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Foster
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada, ex rel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?