Kornberg v. United States of America et al

Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs and United States of America
Plaintiff: Melvin Kornberg
Case Number: 2:2012cv01961
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 51 Motion Requesting Exception to Settlement Conference Attendance Requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 27, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 39 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 7, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 4/23/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 9, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Extend Time. Dispositive Motions due by 2/13/2015.FURTHER ORDERED that no further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 31, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 32 Motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions re 26 Scheduling Order. Motions due by 1/22/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/31/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 12, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. Department of Veteran Affairs answer due 5/29/2013; United States of America answer due 5/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/12/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kornberg v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Kornberg
Represented By: Kirk T Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?