Jacobi v. Ergen et al

Defendant: Joseph P. Clayton, R. Stanton Dodge, Michael T. Dugan, Charles W. Ergen, David K. Moskowitz, Tom A. Ortolf and C. Michael Schroeder
Nominal Defendant: EchoStar Corporation
Plaintiff: Greg Jacobi
Case Number: 2:2012cv02075
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 29:1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 50 Motion to Dismiss; the complaint is DISMISSED under FRCP 23.1 for failure to file a pre-suit demand or sufficiently plead demand futility. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 56 Motion to Strike is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 26, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 51 Stipulation to Extend Time re 50 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/29/2015. Replies due by 6/12/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 30, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part 17 Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint is Dismissed Without Prejudice for Failure to File a Pre-suit Demand or Sufficiently Plead Demand Futility. Amended Complaint deadline: 4/20/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 30, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Defendants' Motion for a Status Check. Status check set for 5/3/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobi v. Ergen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Clayton
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Stanton Dodge
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Dugan
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Ergen
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David K. Moskowitz
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom A. Ortolf
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Michael Schroeder
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: EchoStar Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Jacobi
Represented By: John P. Aldrich
Represented By: Eduard Korsinsky
Represented By: Steven J. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?