Perez-Alvarez v. United States of America et al
Petitioner: David Perez-Alvarez
Respondent: Steven M. Branch, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Director Leander B. Holston, Janet Napolitano and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2012cv02088
Filed: December 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that 2 Motion for a Stay of Deportation is DENIED as Moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 17 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as Moot in light of respondents' second motion to dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that 26 Motion for an Extension of Time is GRANTED, nunc pro tunc, to April 15, 2013. FURTHER ORDERED that 27 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is DENIED a Certificate of Appealability. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/29/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that 23 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 17 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED. Replies due by 4/15/2013. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition as Moot. Replies due by 4/1/2013. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that 18 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 17 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Responses due by 3/1/2013. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Clerk shall serve copies of the Petition 1 , Emergency Motion 2 , and this order upon respondents. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents SHALL FILE AND SERVE an answer/response within 15 days from the date this order is entered. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner SHALL FILE AND SERVE a reply to respondents' answer/response within 10 days of the date that petitioner is served with the same. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Alvarez v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven M. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Leander B. Holston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Carlos A Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Perez-Alvarez
Represented By: Xavier Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?