Blunt v. United States of America

Defendant: Don Jay Blunt and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2012cv02191
Filed: December 24, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Jennifer Diane Olivas (aka Jennifer Diane Pellegrino) on the United States' claims against her contained in the Second Amended Counterclaim 27 . FURTHER ORDERED that as of March 1 , 2016, Olivas is indebted to the United States for tax assessments made against her pursuant to 26 U.S.C. § 6672 for tax periods specified in the Second Amended Counterclaim in the amount of $815,809.48, with interest continuing to accrue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961(c)(1) and 26 U.S.C. § 6621. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 13, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 58 Motion to Lift Stay and Amend the Scheduling Order is GRANTED. The Court amends the scheduling order as follows: Discovery due by 9/30/2016. Motions due by 11/4/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/2/2016. All other terms and deadlines set forth in the scheduling order (Docket No. 33 ) which have not been modified by this order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 21, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Don Jay Blunt on the United States' claims against him contained in the United States' Second Amended Counterclaim (Dkt. # 27 ). ORDERED that Don Jay Blunt shall take nothing by his Complaint (Dkt. # 1 ), which is dismissed with prejudice.FURTHER ORDERED that Don Jay Blunt is indebted to the United States for the tax periods ended September 30, 2005, December 31, 2005, March 31, 2006, June 30, 2006, September 30, 2006, Decemb er 31, 2006, March 31, 2007, June 30, 2007, September 30, 2007, December 31, 2007, March 31, 2008, June 30, 2008, September 30, 2008, December 31, 2008, March 31, 2009, June 30, 2009, September 30, 2009, and December 31, 2009 in the amount of $1 ,001,668.82 plus additional interest accruing from December 18, 2015 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961(c)(1) and 26 U.S.C. § 6621. FURTHER ORDERED that all claims by or against Don Jay Blunt are DISMISSED with prejudice, with each side to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 8, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Offer in Compromise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 14, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 40 Motion to Substitute Attorney is GRANTED. Attorney Terry A. Coffing is substituted in place and stead of Attorney Jeffrey Blaine Setness for Don Jay Blunt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 29, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey B. Setness is substituted in place and stead of the law firm of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP for Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Don Jay Blunt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/29/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 1, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 25 Defendant/Counter-Claimant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 08/01/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 23, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Notice of Bankruptcy and Joint Request for Order Staying Case and Extending Deadlines. The Parties shall notify the Court as soon as the stay in Case No. 13-12765-bam is lifted or modified so as to allow this matter to proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 5, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Motion and Special Show Cause to Permit Appearance of Government Counsel Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Boris Kukso. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blunt v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Jay Blunt
Represented By: George P Kelesis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?