Wilson v. Walmart et al

Defendant: Rossanna M. Alsted and Walmart
Plaintiff: David Lawrence Wilson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00207
Filed: February 7, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 76 Motion to Amend Complaint. Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s 67 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted. Plaintiff's 79 Motion to Respond and Defendant's 82 Motion to Strike are Denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 4, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 62 Motion to Add Wells Enterprises, Inc. as a Defendant in this Matter is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 66 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 24, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 63 Motion to Compel and granting 69 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 10, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 45 Motion to Amend Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 29, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Dismiss as to Vons Companies, Inc. Denying 22 Motion to Add Safeway as a Defendant. Granting 23 Motion toAdd Walmart as a Defendant. Amended Complaint deadline: 5/28/2014. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 4/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 6, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming 5 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Bellevue Ice Cream Plant and Defendant Safeway Inc. are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 4, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint. Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 7/3/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 06/03/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Walmart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossanna M. Alsted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lawrence Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?