Stirling Mortimer Global Property Fund PCC Limited v. Roberts et al

Defendant: Regal Property Holdings, Inc., Jane Sheridan Roberts and Richard Neill Trevor Roberts
Plaintiff: Stirling Mortimer Global Property Fund PCC Limited
Case Number: 2:2013cv00301
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 15 Certificate of Cash Deposit, 17 Certificate of Cash Deposit, 16 Certificate of Cash Deposit are exonerated and the Clerk of Court is directed to release the funds to the rightful owner. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
December 30, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 82 Stipulation to Dismiss Case with prejudice. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 3, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 37 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Stirling Mortimer Global Property Fund PCC Limited. This Order shall remain in place pending a full determination of Plaintiffs causes of action on the merits or upon further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 1, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 57 Plaintiff's Request for Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 21, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that parties file briefs by 4/4/13 discussing whether 40 Letter should remain sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stirling Mortimer Global Property Fund PCC Limited v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Property Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Marla J DaVee
Represented By: Samuel S. Lionel
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Sheridan Roberts
Represented By: Marla J DaVee
Represented By: Samuel S. Lionel
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Neill Trevor Roberts
Represented By: Marla J DaVee
Represented By: Samuel S. Lionel
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stirling Mortimer Global Property Fund PCC Limited
Represented By: David M. Bennion
Represented By: Michael R. Kealy
Represented By: Cory D Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?