Securities and Exchange Commission v. Inteligentry, LTD et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Inteligentry, LTD, PTP Licensing, LTD, Plasmerg, Inc. and John P. Rohner
Case Number: 2:2013cv00344
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER Granting Receiver Sally McMinime's 556 Motion for Order Approving Final Distribution of Receivership Assets, Approving Payment of Final Attorney's Fees and Expenses, Approving Wind up of Receivership and Discharging Receiver. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 510 FINAL JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION against John P. Rohner. Defendant Rohner is liable, jointly and severally with the Corporate Defendants, for disgorgement of $1,822,825, representing identified ill-gotten gains received as a result o f the unlawful conduct found by the Court, together with prejudgment interest in the amount of $411,100.48, for a total disgorgement of $2,233,925.48. Defendant Rohner is liable for a civil money penalty of $750,000. Defendant Rohn er shall satisfy these obligations by paying $2,983,925.48 to the Securities and Exchange Commission within 14 days after entry of this Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER Granting 501 Joint Motion to File a Proposed Plan of Distriubtion, Continue Hearing, and Allow the Receiver to Appear Telephonically. The Receiver shall file the proposed Distribution Plan by 6/27/2017. The hearing currently scheduled fo r 7/5/2017 at 3:00 p.m. shall be continued to 7/12/2017 at 4:45 PM in LV Courtroom 7D. The Receiver is allowed to attend the 7/5/2017 hearing or any date to which the hearing may be continued telephonically. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER Granting Receiver's 466 Motion for Fees and Expenses in the amount of $23,875.33. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER Denying Defendant Rohner's 480 Motion to Unseal Court Files and Records from the Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER Granting 472 Joint Motion for Supplement to Order Appointing Receiver. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER Granting 307 Notice of Disassociation of Counsel and Request to Remove Attorney Dominic P. Gentile as counsel for Defendant Inteligentry, Ltd. from Electronic Noticing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER. Ms. Sally McMinimee, Esq. is appointed to serve without bond as receiver for the estates of the Receivership Defendants. The Court takes exclusive jurisdiction and possession of the assets of the following Defendants : Inteligentry, Ltd.; PlasmERG, Inc.; and PTP Licensing, Ltd. The Receivership Defendants and all persons receiving notice of this Order are restrained and enjoined from directly or indirectly taking any action or causing any action to be taken without the express written agreement of the Receiver. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER Granting SEC's 50 Motion to Dismiss Rohner's Counter-Claims;SEC's 109 Motion to Hold Rohner in Civil Contempt and to Appoint a Receiver is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. The appointment of the Receiver is STAYED pending a status conference;Status Conference set for 4/13/2015 at 10:00 a.m.; Corporate Defendant's 121 Motion to Dismiss is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. The SEC shall have 21 days from the date of this Order to file an Amende d Complaint; SEC's 129 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is Granted in Part and Denied in Part;Rohner's 140 Motion to Dismiss PlasmERG (Iowa) as a Party is Denied without prejudice; Corporate Defendant's 158 Motion for Release of $24,341.58 to Pay Attorney's Fees is Denied without prejudice;Rohner's 169 Motion to Remove Restraint Order is Denied;Corporate Defendant's 178 Motion for Instruction Regarding Returned Seized Property is Granted; Rohner's 179 Motion to Hold the SEC in Civil Contempt is Denied;Rohner's 183 Motion to Dismiss is Denied;Rohner's 184 Motion for an Order to Release Frozen Funds to Pay Bills is Denied without prejudice;< p> Corporate Defendant's 215 Motion for Release of $12,846.25 to Pay Attorney's Fees is Denied without prejudice; SEC's 233 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is Granted in Part and Denied in Part; Rohner's [243 ] Motion to Clarify Plasm ERG,Inc (Iowa) Status in this Case is Denied without prejduice; Rohner's 246 Motion to have Returned Seized Property Released is Denied; and Rohner's 257 Motion to Release Frozen Funds to Pay Attorney Fees is Denied. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER Denying Defendant John Rohner's 190 Motion to Provide a Court Order to Provide Banking Records and Business Records for Michael G. Girouard, Unity International and All Others Associated with Same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Denying Defendant's 139 Motion to Remove Invalid Claimants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Denying 124 Motion to Understand How and to Stop the Invasion of Privacy by the SEC Collecting All Personal Communications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting 116 Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Denying 112 Motion to Impeach Declaration of Kenneth J. Guido. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Denying 104 Motion for Sale of Stored Materials. Denying 106 Amended Motion for Sale of Stored Materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting 45 MOTION to Extend Extend Appearance Time. Granting in Part and Denying in Part 47 MOTION to Release Corporation Funds. Denying Without prejudice 43 , 46 , 66 MOTIONS to Dismiss, 90 MOTION to Remove Invalid Claimants, and 95 Motion to Change Venue. Attorney designation deadline: 9/4/2013. Answer due by 10/4/2013. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/7/2013 Nunc Pro Tunc 8/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Denying 97 Motion to Quash Deposition of Investor and Licensed Manufacturer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Denying 69 Motion to Join or Merge (Joinder). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/1/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Denying 41 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Denying 84 Motion to Quash to Quash Depositions Per Issuance of Subpoenas Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Denying 44 Motion to Release Confiscated and Removed Items. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying 36 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order due by 5/16/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 3 Ex Parte Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Related Relief. The Hearing scheduled for 3/21/2013 at 2:30 p.m., is VACATED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Unseal the entire record. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/7/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Inteligentry, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inteligentry, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTP Licensing, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plasmerg, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Rohner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Kenneth J Guido
Represented By: Christopher M. McLean
Represented By: Hemma B Ramrattan
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?