Karayan v. Mardian et al

Plaintiff: Edward Karayan
Defendant: Leonard Mardian and Susan Mardian
Case Number: 2:2013cv00472
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Amending Award of Attorney's Fees re 35 Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that my prior orders regarding payment of fees and costs are amended such that defendants shall pay to plaintiff $8,851.30 in eight monthly installments of $1,000 each, plus a final payment of $851.30. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 6, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Awarding Attorney's Fees re 32 Declaration. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that defendants shall pay to plaintiff $8,851.30, representing the fees and costs incurred in obtaining the default and default judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 20, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment. It Is Further Ordered that 23 Clerk's Entry of Default and 27 Order on Motion for Judgment are Vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file an answer to the complaint no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 1, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Motion for Judgment in favor of plaintiff Edward Karayan Trustee of the Karayan Family Trust and against defendants Susan Mardian and Leonard Mardian in the amount of $1,570,335.60. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karayan v. Mardian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Karayan
Represented By: Burton C Jacobson
Represented By: Richard L Tobler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Mardian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Mardian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?