Lee v. United States Of America

Plaintiff: Theodore F. Lee
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv00483
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 73 is ADOPTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Objections 80 are OVERRULLED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED as moot. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
August 11, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 78 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Objections to Report of Findings and Recommendation 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding 3 Amended Complaint. Objections to R&R now due by 9/25/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
June 22, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 76 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Objections re 73 Report and Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 30, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 73 Report and Recommendation. Responses due by 6/17/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
December 1, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot 62 Motion to Stay. Lees request to consolidate this action with the tax refund action is Denied. Show Cause Response due by 12/30/2014. Responsive Memorandum due by 1/14/2015. Reply due by 1/21/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 3, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the above-caption action be STAYED and the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 3/7/2014 in the event the matter is not resolved and a Stipulation to Dismiss the action filed before that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 03/03/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 8, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this action continue to be STAYED re 57 Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/08/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 25, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this action continue to be stayed and the parties shall filea Joint Status Report on or before 1/4/2014, in the event the matter is not resolved and a Stipulation to Dismiss the action filed before that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 6, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this Action continue to be stayed and the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 11/22/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 19, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this action continue to be stayed and the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 10/4/2013, in the event the matter is not resolved and a Stipulation to Dismiss the action filed before that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 13, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. David Bujannoff Porter, Jr withdrawn from the case. A Scheduling and Status Hearing is set for 5/21/2013 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore F. Lee
Represented By: Christopher M Cook
Represented By: George P Kelesis
Represented By: Edward E.O.C. Ord
Represented By: David Bujannoff Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?