Chambers v. Nevens et al

Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Warden Nevens
Petitioner: 67693 Andrew Earl Chambers
Case Number: 2:2013cv00489
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 14 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. Respondents shall have through May 2, 2014 to file and serve an answer or other response to the petition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/2/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 8, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Respondents' 16 Motion to Dismiss. The action is Dismissed with prejudice because it is untimely. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Further Ordered that a certificate of appealability is Denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 1, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/1/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF CC: Petitioner with required documents - SLR)
April 11, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider. The 4 order and the 5 Judgment dismissing this action is VACATED, and this action is REINSTATED. Payment of filing fee due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Nevens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Nevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 67693 Andrew Earl Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.