Oney v. Hollingsworth

Defendant: C/O Hollingsworth
Plaintiff: Rodney F. Oney
Case Number: 2:2013cv00492
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Informal Settlement Discussions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 26, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 23, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Plaintiff will have 30 days to submit his amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 3 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED and 5 Plaintiff's Motion for a Status Check is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Blank Complaint form and Instructions to Plaintiff - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oney v. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Hollingsworth
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney F. Oney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.