Ferguson v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: James Ferguson
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00517
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting with Prejudice 82 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 17, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a stipulation and order of dismissal be filed with the court on or before July 27, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 13, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 9, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot 55 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 1, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 20 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 37 Motion Clarify Court's 34 Order Regarding The Striking of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Clerk of the Court shall reinstate Plaintiffs 14 Amended Complaint as to all parties except Defendant BRR Architecture, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 3, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Defendant's Motion to Strike 14 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/03/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ferguson
Represented By: Jared B Anderson
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Represented By: Anthony Julian Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?