Norsoph v. Riverside Resort and Casino, Inc. et al

Defendant: Donald Laughlin and Riverside Resort and Casino, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Norsoph
Case Number: 2:2013cv00580
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the stay in this action is continued to 98 days. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report on or before January 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 3, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the stay in this action is continued for 60 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report on or before October 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 08/03/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 12, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the stay in this action is continued for 45 days. Status Report due by 6/1/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
April 1, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report on or before 4/11/16. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 25, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this action is STAYED until 30 days after the date on which the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals issues a final resolution in the case entitled Oregon Restaurant and Lodging et al. v. Solis, et al. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 19, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a status report on or before 8/20/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 10, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a status report by 2/10/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 23, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a further status report in 120 days from the date of this order or as soon as the Ninth Circuit case is decided, whichever occurs first. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 17, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file his Certificate of Interested Parties by 4/29/2013. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norsoph v. Riverside Resort and Casino, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Resort and Casino, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Norsoph
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Dana Sniegocki
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?