Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Union Local 525 Health and Welfare Trust and Plan et al v. Sotelo Air, Inc.

Defendant: Sotelo Air, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union 525 Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust for Southern Nevada, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Union Local 525 Health and Welfare Trust and Plan and Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Union Local 525 Pension Plan
Case Number: 2:2013cv00657
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2016 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 122 Motion to Extend Time re 18 Motion to Dismiss in case 2:14-cv-1609. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 03/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 26, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part Defendants' 115 Motion to Extend Time to Retain Counsel (First Request). The corporate defendants must retain counsel, who shall file a notice of appearance on the docket no later than 03/10/2016. Mr. Sotelo must eithe r have new counsel file a notice of appearance on his behalf or he must file a notice that he intends to proceed pro se no later than 03/10/2016. No further extension will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 5, 2016 107 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER that a motion hearing re 104 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is set for 1/26/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Defendants' current counsel of record shall serve Defendants with this order and file proof of service no later than 01/08/2016. Any response to the 104 motion to withdraw shall be filed no later than 01/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/05/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 7, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 102 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/04/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 18, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 98 Stipulation to Withdraw 96 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default and 97 Clerk's Entry of Default. Now Services of Nevada, LLC answer due 11/20/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) Modified on 11/19/2015 (NEV).
October 26, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 88 Stipulation to Extend Time re 85 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Responses due by 10/27/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 23, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 58 Motion to Seal to Seal and File Redacted Exhibit. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 19, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging the 37 Order to Show Cause. Defendants' counsel shall file an Amended Joint Interim Status Report by 3/26/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 6, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 24 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. William J Wray withdrawn from the case. Counsel shall file proof of service no later than 12/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 5, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Answer and Denying without prejudice 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. The 20 Answer on behalf of Sotelo Air, Inc. dba Cool Air Now, Aegis Security Ins. Co., and A merican Safety Casualty Ins. Co. is STRICKEN. Sotelo Air, Inc. dba Cool Air Now, Aegis Security Ins. Co., and American Safety Casualty Ins. Co. shall have up through and including 12/20/2013, to retain counsel and have new counsel file an answer on their behalf. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/05/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Union Local 525 Health and Welfare Trust and Plan et al v. Sotelo Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sotelo Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union 525 Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust for Southern Nevada
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Union Local 525 Health and Welfare Trust and Plan
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Union Local 525 Pension Plan
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?