Kal-Mor-USA, LLC v. Bank of America, NA et al

Defendant: Bank of America, NA, Bank of New York Mellon and ReconTrust Co., NA
Plaintiff: Kal-Mor-USA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00680
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' 57 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is Denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a new discovery plan and scheduling order that complies with LR 26-1 by June 28, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 06/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 29, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 51 Stipulation re 29 Answer to Complaint - Petition for Removal,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim. Canyon Willows Homeowners Association answer due 4/25/2016. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 15, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Stipulation re 29 Answer. Responses due by 3/25/2016. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 4, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation re 29 Crossclaim and Counterclaim. Canyon Willows Homeowners Association answer due 3/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 9, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation re 29 Counterclaim. Kal-Mor-USA, LLC answer due 3/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 3, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation. Canyon Willows Homeowners Association answer due 2/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 26, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation re 29 Crossclaim, Counterclaim. Kal-Mor-USA, LLC answer due 2/2/2016. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 1/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 4, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Motions due by 11/17/2015; Responsive Briefs due by 12/1/2015; Reply brief due by 12/14/2015. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 8, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kal-Mor-USA, LLC v. Bank of America, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Represented By: Edward Chang
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Co., NA
Represented By: Edward Chang
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kal-Mor-USA, LLC
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?