Farmer et al v. MGM Grand Hotel, LLC

Defendant: MGM Grand Hotel, LLC
Plaintiff: Diane Eson and Rashaunda Farmer
Case Number: 2:2013cv00686
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 35 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline Date is granted as follows: Discovery is extended or reopened through June 23, 2014 to conduct the discovery authorized above. FURTHER ORDERED that the following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply: Last date to file dispositve motions: July 23, 2014; Last date to file joint pretrial order: August 22, 2104. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 40 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is granted as follows: Plaintiffs are permitted to file a Second Amended Complaint adding FDR Management, LLC as a defendant in this action, in its capacity as the employer of the security officer s whose conduct is at issue in this lawsuit. Plaintiffs are directed to promptly file and serve a revised Second Amended Complaint in conformance with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 6, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 39 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer et al v. MGM Grand Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Grand Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Eson
Represented By: Ursula Y. Holmes
Represented By: Romeo Ruiz Perez
Represented By: LaShawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashaunda Farmer
Represented By: Ursula Y. Holmes
Represented By: Romeo Ruiz Perez
Represented By: LaShawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.