Katynski v. Saint-Gobain Corp.

Defendant: CertainTeed Gypsum Manufacturing, Inc. and Saint-Gobain Corp.
Plaintiff: Allen Katynski
Case Number: 2:2013cv00752
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 88 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 8, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/8/2015 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: James J. Lee; Def Counsel: Anthony Martin, Brian Bradford; Time of Hearing: 2:23; Courtroom: 3B; It Is Ordered that 79 Motion for Exception to the Personal Attendance Requirement is Denied. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 18, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 68 Stipulation. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/28/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 22, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 9, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the Saint Gobain Corporation is dismissed from this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 11, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), and the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katynski v. Saint-Gobain Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Gypsum Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Katynski
Represented By: John Peter Lee
Represented By: James J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?