Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC v. Galam et al
Plaintiff: Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC
Defendant: Abraham Assil, Canico Capital Group, LLC, Crazy Horse Too Gentlemen's Club LLC, El Marino, LLC, George Eshaghian, Michael Galam, Victor Galam, Jacqueline Galam Barnes, Djavid Hakakian, IJ Properties, LLC, Industrial Road 2440-2497, LLC, Isaac Javdanfar, Knotting Hill, LLC, Soleiman Nazarian, Morris Nejathaim, Olympic Capital Venture, LLC, Rhino Bare Project 4824 LLC, Rhino Bare Projects LLC, S Double, LLC, SN & GE, LLC, Mehran Sadighpour, Kamran Samooha, Sefox Investment, LLC, West Best Capital Group, LLC and Hamed Yazdanpanah
Case Number: 2:2013cv00776
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the $100.00 bond, plus any accrued interest, be returned to the Legal Owner at: Puoy K. Premsriut, Esq., 520 South Fourth Street, Second Floor, Las Vegas, NV 89101. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF -cc: Finance - JQC)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER Granting 413 Stipulated Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER Granting 414 Stipulated Voluntary Dismissal as to defendants IJ Properties, LLC, Isaac Javdanfar, Knotting Hill, LLC, Morris Nejathaim, S Double, LLC, Mehran Sadighpour, Kamran Samooha, Sefox Investment, LLC, Hamed Yazdanpanah, El Marino, LLC and Djavid Hakakian. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER Granting 384 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Jason Hicks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting 374 Stipulation to Extend Time. Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order due by 4/3/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER that 336 , 337 , 338 , and 339 Defendants' Motions to Reconsider and Request for Judicial Notice are DENIED AS MOOT based upon the rulings on the motions for summary judgment.FURTHER ORDERED that 346 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to all Galam Defendants.FURTHER ORDERED that 348 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice as to all Hakakian Defendants.FURTHER ORDERED that 351 Plaintiff's Motion for Su mmary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice as to the Assil Defendants and GRANTED as to Canico Defendants. FURTHER ORDERED that 361 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED as moot given the consent of the Defendants to the preservation of any assets or proceeds from the sale of the subject property in this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER Granting 319 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Ariel E. Stern and Allison R. Schmidt are substituted in place and stead of Michael R. Mushkin and Michael Thomas Smith for Canico Capital Group, LLC and Industrial Road 2440-2497, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER that 274 Motion to Withdraw as Co-Counsel for Defendants is GRANTED. To the extent Plaintiff files any motion seeking an award of attorneys' fees or other sanction against withdrawing counsel, Plaintiff must ensure that such motion is served on withdrawing counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER that 177 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 181 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's remaining Motions for Summary Judgment 180 , 183 , 184 , and 187 are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that Russell Road shall submit a motion and proposed order specifying the relief it seeks, within the parameters set in this Order, by May 10, 2016. Defendants' response is due by May 24, 2016 and any reply is due by June 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER that 223 Motion Requesting an Order for the Production of Documents is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER that 175 Motion for Clarification is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER that 150 Motion to Disqualify Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/31/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER that 140 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER that the Hearing set for May 16, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER that 154 and 155 Motions to Appear Telephonically at the Hearing Set for May 16, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule 10-5(b), that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER that 147 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER that 135 Motion to Stay Case or Modify Scheduling Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER that 91 Motion to Vacate 46 Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the court's order granting plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 46 is VACATED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER that 84 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 70 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Denying 71 , 85 , 88 Motions to Strike and 89 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DENYING 111 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Proposed discovery plan due 10/11/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting 105 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 99 MOTION to Strike. Response due by 10/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting in part 77 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Conduct Discovery and to Set a Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Vacate. Expedited Discovery due by 8/16/2013. Renewed Motion due by 8/23/2013. Responses due by 8/30/2013. Reply due by 9/6/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re 77 Emergency MOTION For Discovery to Properly Brief Preliminary Injunction Motions and Motion for Regular Briefing Schedule filed by Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC. Responses due by 7/24/2013. Replies due by 7/26/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Denying as moot 61 Defendant Michael Galam, et al.'s Emergency Motion to Vacate or Modify Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this court ISSUES an indicative statement that defendants motion to vacate or modify the preliminary injunction raises a substantial issue under Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Denying 55 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Enforce and Modify Preliminary Injunction and Request for an Order to Show Cause as to Why Defendants should not be help in civil and criminal contempt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 56 Order to Show Cause is VACATED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 4 Plaintiff Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the $100 cash deposit previously made by Russell Road as a security for the temporary restraining order shall remain on deposit with the Clerk of the Court as security for this preliminary injunction pending the final disposition of this case or further order of this Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Russell Road shall provide security for this temporary restraining order by tendering $100 cash to the Clerk of the Court. Defendants shall file and serve their opposition to Russell Roads 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 5/13/2013. Russell Road shall file and serve its reply brief in support of its 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 5/17/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 05/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC v. Galam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Assil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canico Capital Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crazy Horse Too Gentlemen's Club LLC
Represented By: Bryan C Altman
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Represented By: Michael Thomas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Marino, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Eshaghian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Galam
Represented By: Bryan C Altman
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Represented By: Michael Thomas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Galam
Represented By: Bryan C Altman
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Represented By: Michael Thomas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Galam Barnes
Represented By: Bryan C Altman
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Represented By: Michael Thomas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Djavid Hakakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IJ Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Road 2440-2497, LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Javdanfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knotting Hill, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soleiman Nazarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Nejathaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympic Capital Venture, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhino Bare Project 4824 LLC
Represented By: Bryan C Altman
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Represented By: Michael Thomas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhino Bare Projects LLC
Represented By: Bryan C Altman
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Represented By: Michael Thomas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Double, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SN & GE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehran Sadighpour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamran Samooha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sefox Investment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Best Capital Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamed Yazdanpanah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Represented By: Puoy K. Premsrirut
Represented By: Bruno Tarabichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?