Martinez et al v. Safeguard Properties, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susie K. Holmes and William G. Martinez
Defendant: Safeguard Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01012
Filed: June 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/3/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying 24 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order without prejudice. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/04/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Proposed Order for Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Matthew P. Pawlowski is substituted in place and stead of Attorney James T. Imperiale. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 08/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Oppostion (Doc. 7 ) and Granting (Doc. 3 ) Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue. Case transferred to District of Nevada. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 6/4/2013. (srm)[Transferred from California Southern on 6/6/2013.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Safeguard Properties, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie K. Holmes
Represented By: James T. Imperiale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G. Martinez
Represented By: James T. Imperiale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Jack P. Burden
Represented By: Colette Magnetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?