Centofanti v. Neven et al
Petitioner: III Alfred Paul Centofanti
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Dwight W. Neven
Case Number: 2:2013cv01080
Filed: June 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 109 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents have 60 days from the date of entry of an order ruling on 106 Motion for Reconsideration to file their answer. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/2/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion to Dismiss. Respondents have until May 24, 2024, to FILE and SERVE an answer addressing the remaining claims in Centofantis first-amended petition. Centofanti will have 60 days from the date of service of the answer to FILE AND SERVE a reply. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/25/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting ECF No. 102 Motion to Extend Time re 85 Motion to Dismiss. Respondents have until September 4, 2023, to file their reply. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) Modified to link to underlying motion on 8/9/2023 (EDS).
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Granting 99 Motion to Extend Time re 85 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/28/2023. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that respondents' unopposed fourth motion for extension of time to file a response to the first-amended habeas corpus petition [ECF No. 83 ] is GRANTED. Respondents have until May 15, 2023, to file their response. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 81 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer 74 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attorney General of the State of Nevada answer due 3/14/2023; Dwight W. Neven answer due 3/14/2023. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Motion to Extend Time to Answer 74 Amended Petition. Attorney General of the State of Nevada answer due 1/13/2023; Dwight W. Neven answer due 1/13/2023. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Extend Time to Answer 74 Amended Petition. Attorney General of the State of Nevada answer due 11/14/2022; Dwight W. Neven answer due 11/14/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/12/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
July 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Centofanti's unopposed sixth motion to extend time [ECF No. 71 ] is GRANTED. Centofanti has until July 18, 2022, to file his amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Motion to Extend Time to File an Amended Petition. Amended Petition due by 6/16/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/10/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 Motion to Extend Time; Amended Petition due by 1/31/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Motion to Extend Time re 62 Order (Second Request). Amended Petition due by 11/1/2021. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 61 Motion to Extend Time re 59 Order (First Request). Amended Petition due by 9/2/2021. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 58 Motion to Reopen Case. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 45 Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Release is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 47 Petitioner's Motion to Reopen for Limited Purpose of Litigating Emergency Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Expediting Briefing re 45 Emergency Motion for Release. Responses due by 4/27/2020. Replies due by 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that 34 Motion for Issuance of Stay and Abeyance is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 38 Motion to Suspend Briefing is GRANTED and all scheduling deadlines set in this Court's order of April 29, 2014 33 areVACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending the resolution of petitioner's second post-conviction habeas petition (Eighth District Case No. 01C172534) and any appeal therefrom. FURTHER ORDERED that the grant of a stay is conditioned upon petitioner returning to federal court with a motion to reopen the case within forty-five (45) days of the issuance of the entry and notice of the state district court's order, or if an appeal is taken, the remittitur by the Supreme Court of Nevada, at the conclusio n of the state court proceedings on the second post-conviction habeas petition, whichever is later. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk SHALL ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action, until such time as the Court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/2/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that petitioner shall have 60 days from the date of entry of this order, to file and serve on respondents an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus, or other appropriate motion or pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall hav e 30 days after service of amended petition to answer. If respondents file an answer, petitioner shall have 30 days to file and serve a reply. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that 5 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File a Petition with Excess Pages is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 3 Petitioner's Motion for a Stay of Proceedings is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 28 Peti tioner's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibits is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 4 and 6 Petitioner's Motions for Appointment of Counsel are GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent petitioner. Cle rk of Court shall electronically serve the FPD a copy of this order, with a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus and all of its attachments. FPD shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to undertake direct representation of petitioner or to indicate to the Court its inability. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to the CJA Coordinator. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copies provided as ordered - EDS)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the clerk shall electronically serve the petition and motions upon respondents. Responses due within 30 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centofanti v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dwight W. Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: III Alfred Paul Centofanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?