Saintal v. Foster et al

Respondent: Sheryl Foster
Petitioner: Priscella R. Saintal
Defendant: State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2013cv01295
Filed: July 22, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for petitioner shall meet with petitioner as soon as reasonably possible. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have 90 days to FILE AND SERVE an amended petitioner for writ of habeas corpus. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any state court exhibits filed by the parties herein shall be filed with an index of exhibits identifying the exhibits by number or letter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court SHALL MODIFY the docket to remove petitioner' ;s address and replace it with the address for the Federal Public Defender's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall file no further pro se documents and shall proceed by and through appointed counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 26, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Petitioner's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The habeas corpus petition shall be filed by the Clerk of Court. The Clerk shall send petitioner the approved form for filing a petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254, the Instructions for Filing a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and a copy of the [1-1] habeas corpus petition submitted in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days from the date of the ent ry of this order, petitioner shall file an amended petition on the approved form provided by the Court. Petitioner's failure to comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - forms and copy mailed to Petitioner - SLD)
April 28, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall electronically serve 4 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Priscella R. Saintal upon the respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 45 days from entry of this order within which to answer, or otherwise respond to, 4 amended petition. Petitioner shall have 45 days from the date of service of answer to file a reply. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saintal v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheryl Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Priscella R. Saintal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.