Nix v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Bryan Anthony Nix
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv01305
Filed: July 23, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2271 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 56 Plaintiff's Request to Continue Hearing is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion Hearing on 51 Defendant's Motion to Strike Late-Disclosed Damages is rescheduled for 9/29/2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas Courtroom 3A. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 28, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 52 Defendant's Motion to Stay Submission of Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is GRANTED. The Court will reset the proposed pretrial order deadline once it rules on Defendant's pending 51 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 6, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 37 the Motion is DENIED in part as to excluding the "Timing Document" (as defined in the Motion) and witness Luke Smith of the City of Henderson, and the Motion is GRANTED in part as to reopening discovery. See Order for further details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 28, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Government's 27 Motion for Exception from 26 Order Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 04/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nix v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Anthony Nix
Represented By: Jay A Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?