Barren v. Kohn et al
Plaintiff: Donald Robin Barren
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Stewart Bell, Maryan Brady, Howard Brooks, Fred W. Burns, Drew Christensen, Cal Derwood, D. Fierro, D. Fulton, Judy Hildebrant, Thomas C. Johnson, Philip J. Kohn, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Sheriff, Bobette Lee, (fnu) Miller, J. Nash, D.W. Neven, North Las Vegas Police Chief, JoAnn Orduna, Jeffrey Roe and JoNell Thomas
Case Number: 2:2013cv01492
Filed: August 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment ECF No. 48 is GRANTED. Count I is dismissed, and Defendants are entitled to summary judgmentagainst Count II; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 05/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - Clerk shall e-serve AG this Order, a copy of ECF No. 30 Screening order, and ECF No. 29 Second amended complaint. (E-service 9/6/2016; ECF Nos. 29 , 30 via NEF Regeneration. ) AG shall by 9/27/2016 file notice re acceptance of service, and file under seal Ds' address(es) for which service not accepted. P must file a motion re unserved Ds. If service accepted by AG, than answer due 11/5/2016. Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 31 Motion to be Excluded from the Inmate Mediation Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint (Second Request). Second Amended Complaint deadline: 3/7/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/02/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint. Second Amended Complaint deadline: 1/21/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Issuance and Service of complaint. The Clerk of Court shall change the docket entry from 19 "Notice of Amended Complaint" to &q uot;Amended Complaint." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 19 amended complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, with leave to amend. The Clerk shall send to Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form with instructions. Plaintiff will have thirty days from the date that this order is entered to submit his amended complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/09/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to direct the Nevada Department of Corrections to cease withdrawals from his account; Granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Longer than Usual Complaint; and Denying 5 Plaint iff's Nunc Pro Tunc Motion as moot. The clerk of the court shall refund to plaintiff any overpayments. The clerk of the court shall file the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The clerk of the court shall enter judgment accordingly. An appeal from the judgment in this action would be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/03/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Finance and the Chief of Corrections - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barren v. Kohn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryan Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred W. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal Derwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Fierro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Hildebrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip J. Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobette Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.W. Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Las Vegas Police Chief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoAnn Orduna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoNell Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Robin Barren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?