Cornett v. Gawker Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Hannah Cornett
Defendant: Gawker Media, LLC and A J Daulerio
Case Number: 2:2013cv01579
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting 83 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Denying 93 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Denying as moot 98 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 89 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint by 7/7/2014. Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is Denied. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying 42 Plaintiffs Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that 24 EX PARTE MOTION shall be unsealed. Responses due by 11/11/2013. Replies due by 11/18/2013. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornett v. Gawker Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gawker Media, LLC
Represented By: J. Colby Williams
Represented By: Philip R Erwin
Represented By: Seth D Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A J Daulerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Cornett
Represented By: Airene Williamson
Represented By: Stephen M Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?