Amezcua et al v. Jordan Tranport, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Humberto Amezcua and Octavio Rene Vazquez Cornejo
Defendant: Luanne Boon and Jordan Tranport, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01608
Filed: September 4, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2016 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 160 the plaintiffs' motion to exceed page limit is DENIED. The 159 Plaintiffs' motion for new trial is STRICKEN. The plaintiffs may file a revised motion for new trial within seven days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 18, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 97 Objections. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 22, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 85 Motion for clarification : As the Court ruled at the Motion Hearing held on June 16, 2016, Defendants Motion (ECF No. 66 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's non-retained medical providers are stricken as medical experts and rebuttal experts. However, the medical providers may testify as percipient witnesses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 24, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that defendant Gerard Boon's motion in limine (ECFNo. 68 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 17, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Louanne Boon shall show cause in writing on or before 1/29/16, why she should not be sanctioned under FRCP 11 or under the Court's inherent power for filing a false answer and a false response to an interrogatory in this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any other party wishing to be heard on the matter may file a brief on or before 1/29/16. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amezcua et al v. Jordan Tranport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humberto Amezcua
Represented By: Erik Fitting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Rene Vazquez Cornejo
Represented By: Erik Fitting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luanne Boon
Represented By: Kenneth R. Bick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Tranport, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Bick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?