U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Queen Victoria #1720-104 NV West Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Queen Victoria #1720-104 NV West Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv01679
Filed: September 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Accepting and Adopting to the extent that it is not inconsistent with this Order 22 Report and Recommendation. Denying 21 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiffs claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Default Judgment. Any renewed Motion for Default Judgment must be filed no later than 10/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Queen Victoria #1720-104 NV West Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen Victoria #1720-104 NV West Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gregory L Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?