LN Management LLC Series 7937 Sierra RIM v. Pfeiffer et al

Plaintiff: LN Management LLC Series 7937 Sierra RIM
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc., Benjamin T. Pfeiffer and Sabrina S. Pfeiffer
Case Number: 2:2013cv01934
Filed: October 22, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2017 114 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Defendants Benjamin and Sabrina Pfeiffer are DISMISSED from the instant action. Summary judgment is entered in favor of CMI and against LN Management on CMI's claims for quiet title and declaratory relief. Summary judgment is entered in favor of CMI and against LN Management on LN Management's claims for quiet title and declaratory relief. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 20, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Benjamin T. Pfeiffer and Sabrina S. Pfeiffer are Dismissed from the instant action. Summary judgment is entered in favor of CMI and against LN Management on CMI's claims for quiet title and declaratory relief. Summa ry judgment is entered in favor of CMI and against LN Management on LN Management's claims for quiet title and declaratory relief. The parties shall submit within 60 days of the filing of this order a proposed final judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 28, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that CitiMortgage, Inc. shall have seven (7) days from the date of this order to respond to LN's invocation of Weeping Hollow. No reply shall be permitted at this time. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 20, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the remaining parties in this case shall submit a joint status report to this court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that the report shall specifically identify what actions the parties are taking to advance or resolve this case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 9, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Federal National Mortgage Association and Federal Housing Finance Agency's 89 Second Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 28, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 97 Motion to Remove Attorney Edward D. Boyack from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 28, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 90 Stipulation to Extend Time re 89 SECOND MOTION for Summary Judgment.( Responses due by 11/3/2016., Replies due by 11/28/2016.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 2, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice intervenors Federal National Mortgage Association and Federal Housing Finance Agency's 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association shall promptly file a notice of constit utional question. This court certifies to the Nevada Attorney General that it may rule on the constitutionality of the state statute at issue in this case, NRS 116.3116. The Attorney General shall have 30 days to intervene on behalf of the state o f Nevada. Plaintiff LN management LLC Series 7927 Sierra RIM's 66 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against CitiMortgage, Federal National Mortgage Association, and Federal Housing Finance Agency is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - mailed via certified mail a certified copy of Order to Nevada Attorney General - SLD)
August 17, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying the parties' 52 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 5, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Stipulation to intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 1, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice Defendant CitiMortgage's 9 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall have 30 days from the entry of a ruling from the Nevada Supreme Court on the question identified in this Order to renew its motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LN Management LLC Series 7937 Sierra RIM v. Pfeiffer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Gregg A. Hubley
Represented By: Christopher A. J. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin T. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina S. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LN Management LLC Series 7937 Sierra RIM
Represented By: Kerry P. Faughnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?