Dollar v. Smith et al
Petitioner: |
Christopher Adam Dollar |
Respondent: |
Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Gregory Smith |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv01952 |
Filed: |
October 24, 2013 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Mahan |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 9, 2019 |
Filing
62
ORDER granting 56 Motion for Hearing; ORDER granting 59 Motion to Extend Time nunc pro tunc; ORDER denying 16 Petition. Certificate of Appealability is denied. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
October 15, 2018 |
Filing
58
ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 46 Motion to Extend Time; ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 48 Motion to Extend Time; ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 53 Motion to Extend Time; ORDER granting 57 Motion to Extend Time Re: 56 Motion for Hearing Before District Judge, Responses due by 12/10/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
September 18, 2018 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting 50 Motion to Extend Time; Replies to Petition due by 9/20/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
August 23, 2018 |
Filing
49
ORDER granting 47 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 16 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Replies due 8/21/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
June 6, 2018 |
Filing
45
ORDER granting 42 Motion to Extend Time nunc pro tunc; ORDER granting 44 Motion to Extend Time; Reply to Petition due by 7/11/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing
41
ORDER Respondents answer due within 45 days of this order; Petitioner shall file his reply, if any, within 30 days of date that respondents file an answer. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
30
ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Dismiss. The Petition is Dismissed without Prejudice as unexhausted. It Is Further Ordered that a Certificate of Appealability is Denied. It Is Further Ordered that 20 , 24 , and 28 Motions for Extension of Time are Granted Nun Pro Tunc. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
August 6, 2014 |
Filing
19
ORDER that respondents shall file a response to the amended petition within 60 days. Petitioner shall have 30 days from service of the answer to file a reply. Granting 14 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
January 30, 2014 |
Filing
8
ORDER that the federal public defender's office is appointed as counsel for petitioner. Amended Petition due within 120 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF ; CC: CJA Coordinator- SLR)
|
December 3, 2013 |
Filing
4
ORDER Granting 1 Petitioner's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting 2 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; and Granting 3 Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk of Court shall file the petition. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender shall be provisionally appointed as counsel and shall have 30 days to undertake direct representation of Petitioner or to indicate the offices inability to represent Petitioner in these proceedings. The Clerk shall add state attorney general Catherine Cortez Masto as counsel for Respondents. Respondents' counsel shall enter a notice of appearance within 21 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/03/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: State Attorney General, FPD, CJA Coordinator and Petitioner, - AC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?