Adkins v. Neven et al
Petitioner: Frederick W. Adkins
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Dwight Neven
Case Number: 2:2013cv02170
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying as moot 85 Motion; Dismissing action with Prejudice; denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/27/2018.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Extend Time. Answer to Petition due on or before 7/19/2017 Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 69 petitioner's motion for a protective order, construed as a motion for reconsideration, is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 68 petitioner's motion for dismissal without prejudice of his unexhausted claims is GRANTED. See Order for further details/deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 55 respondents' motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as further specified herein in the remaining provisions below in this order. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that petitioner shall have thirty (30 ) days from entry of this order within which to mail to the Clerk for filing a motion for dismissal without prejudice of the entire petition or for partial dismissal only of the unexhausted claims described in the preceding paragraph.IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that 61 petitioner's motion for a stay and abeyance is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 58 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. Response due within 60 days re 55 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 53 Motion to Extend Prison Copywork Limit is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that 26 Motion to Seal is Granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 46 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 47 Motion for Leave to File is GRANTED. The Clerk of the court shall file 47 -1 and 47 -2 F irst Amended Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 42 Motion to Amend is DENIED as Moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 18 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. Answer due within 45 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Extend Time to respond to 18 MOTION to Dismiss. Granting 39 Motion to extend his prison copywork limit. Responses due by 1/9/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 29 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) and for an Order Directing Defendants to Serve Plaintiff with 18 MOTION to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that that respondents SHALL SERVE petitioner at his new address (High Desert State Prison ) with a copy of the pending motion to dismiss 18 and all supporting exhibits (ECF Nos. 19-25) within ten (10) days from the date of filing of this order. Respondents SHALL FILE a notice of compliance with the court once service of the motion andex hibits has been accomplished. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 29) in which to file his response to the pending motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Within forty-five(45) days from the date on which petitioner is served with the motion to dismiss and exhibits, petitioner SHALL FILE his response to the motion. FURTHER ORDERED that the duplicate motions filed at ECF Nos. 31 & 32 are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying 6 Petitioner's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 13 and 14 Motions to File a Late Pleading are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents are GRANTED 45 days from the entry of this order in which to answer, or otherwise respond to, the petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. Clerk of Court shall file and electronically serve petition upon respondents. Respondents have 45 days to answer petition. If answer filed, petitioner has 45 days to file a reply. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frederick W. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?