Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania v. Gemini Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Defendant: Gemini Insurance Company, Newport Lofts, LLC and B & R Builders, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02211
Filed: December 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice as unripe. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall close the case. FURTHER ORDERED that 28 and 41 Motions to Dismiss are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that the Trial Date in this matter is set for December 16, 2014, at 9:00 a.m., with Calendar Call on December 8, 2014, at 1:30 p.m., before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that 7 and 10 Motions for Summary Judgment are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 13 Motion to Seal is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania v. Gemini Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Laurence McHeffey
Represented By: Theodore Parker III
Represented By: Stephanie A. Garabedian
Represented By: Nancy A Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Lofts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & R Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?