Guy v. Casal Institute of Nevada, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marni M. Guy
Defendant: Casal Institute of Nevada, LLC, Thomas Ciarnello, John Gronvall and Arthur J. Petrie
Case Number: 2:2013cv02263
Filed: December 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, upon reconsideration of 159 the Court's 8/23/16 Order, 132 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all motions dismissed without prejudice on 9/11/17 at ECF No. 217 ( ECF Nos. 161 , 165 , 167 , 174 , 175 , 189 , 194 ) are now DISMISSED with prejudice as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 223 Plaintiff's Motion to File a Second Supplement is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court enter judgment in favor of Defendants and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER Granting 214 Stipulation to Extend Stay of Discovery to 11/30/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 212 the parties Stipulation to Stay is granted, in part, and denied, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery in this matter is stayed until 9/1/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Denying 210 Stipulation to Stay without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Granting 203 Stipulation re 194 MOTION to Strike re: 190 Notice and 201 Counter MOTION for Attorney Fees . See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Granting 173 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Reply re 165 MOTION to Certify Class. Replies due by 12/27/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Granting 177 Stipulation to Extend Time re 175 MOTION for Entry of Discovery Plan re 129 Order on Stipulation. ( Responses due by 1/11/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 133 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED 132 that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Granting 157 Motion to Remove Attorney Marcus B. Smith from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 08/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Granting 154 Motion to Remove Attorney Oscar Peralta from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 08/09/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting 136 Stipulation Extending Time to File and Serve Responses to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The parties hereby stipulate and agree to extend the deadlin e for filing Defendants' and Plaintiff's responses to 132 and 133 . The new deadline will be Tuesday, 2/16/16.The parties additionally stipulate and agree to the deadline for filing replies in support of 132 and 133 . The deadline will be Monday, 3/21/16. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting 130 Stipulation to Enlarge the Parties' Time to File and Serve Their Motions for Summary Judgment (Second Request) and Stipulation to Exceed the page limit on Dispositive Motion Briefs (First Request). Both parties shall rece ive an enlargement of time, until 1/13/16, in which to file and serve their respective Motions for Summary Judgment. Motion for Summary Judgment brief may exceed the allowable page limit under Local Rule 7-4. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Granting 128 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Denying without prejudice, Plaintiff's 117 Motion to Extend Discovery Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 33 , 53 , and 73 Motions for leave to file supplemental authority. Granting in part and Denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. Individual defendants Arthur J. Petrie, John Gronvall, and Thomas Ciarnello are dismissed from this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 77 Motion to file supplemental authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Certain Discovery and denying 81 Countermotion to Strike Plaintiffs Motion to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Circulation of Notice of Pendency. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 05/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guy v. Casal Institute of Nevada, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casal Institute of Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ciarnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gronvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Petrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marni M. Guy
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Represented By: Dana Sniegocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?